skip to content

Gomez Lora, Claudia Paola

CPSO#: 90291

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Mar 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Universidad De Cartagena, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Of Ottawa
Department Of Anesthesia
Room B307 Mail Stop 249
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-9207
Fax: (613) 761-5209 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Claudia P. Gomez Lora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gomez Lora ( CPSO# 90291 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Department of Anaesthesia
Room B307
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-9207

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA PAOLA GOMEZ LORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMEZ LORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2009 to 15 Apr 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 16 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014