THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:48:33 AM
Gomez Lora, Claudia Paola
CPSO#:
90291
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Mar 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Universidad De Cartagena, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Of Ottawa
Department Of Anesthesia
Room B307 Mail Stop 249
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-9207
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLAUDIA PAOLA GOMEZ LORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMEZ LORA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2009 to 15 Apr 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 16 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |