skip to content

Goldman, Sidney Bernard

CPSO#: 17925

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Division of Cardiac Surgery 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 15 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective:16 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jan 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017