THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:23:28 AM
Goldman, Sidney Bernard
CPSO#:
17925
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Apr 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiac Surgery
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 15 Mar 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jan 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |