skip to content

Goh, Elaine Suk-Ying

CPSO#: 85010

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Genetics - Room 1A100
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4104
Fax: (905) 813-4347 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
Sudbury Outpatient Centre
865 Regent St. S
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 1055
Fax: (705) 523-7178
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Goh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Goh ( CPSO# 85010 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital - Genetics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Room 1A100
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-5104

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Sudbury Outpatient Care
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 18 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELAINE SUK-YING GOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2011