THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 21:49:22 PM
Goh, Elaine Suk-Ying
CPSO#:
85010
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Genetics - Room 1A100
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4104
Fax: (905) 813-4347
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:18 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELAINE SUK-YING GOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2011 |