skip to content

Givari, Renee

CPSO#: 91947

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: 6139384240 Ext. 3524
Fax: 6139385374 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell,
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: (613) 938-4240
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Givari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RENEE GIVARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIVARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2009 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2013