THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 1:07:52 AM
Givari, Renee
CPSO#:
91947
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, French
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Phone: 6139384240 Ext. 3524
Fax: 6139385374
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RENEE GIVARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIVARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2009 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2013 |