skip to content

Gill, Navsheer

CPSO#: 96955

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of East Anglia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-3103
Fax: (905) 853-2533 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Navsheer Gill Toor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gill ( CPSO# 96955 )

Business Address:
10 Princess Margaret Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9A 1Z4
Phone Number: 4167290366

Business Address:
201-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: 9058533103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAVSHEER GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2014