THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:54:06 PM
Gill, Navsheer
CPSO#:
96955
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Toor, Navsheer Gill (used until: 04 Jul 2021 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of East Anglia, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Health
Schulich Family Medicine Teach Unit
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1008
Fax: 416-242-1082
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Navsheer Gill Toor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 23 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAVSHEER GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2014 |