skip to content

Ghobadian, Reza

CPSO#: 86296

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Ghobadian, Mohammad-Reza (used until: 14 Nov 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitby Medical Arts Centre
Suite 18
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (905) 240-4880
Fax: 289-732-2508 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

103-80 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M2N 2H4
Canada
Phone: 647-358-9623
Fax: 844-770-0080
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ghobadian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ghobadian ( CPSO# 86296 )

Business Address:
Whitby Medical Arts Centre
Suite 18
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 240-2880

Business Address:
80 Finch Avenue West
Suite 100
North York ON  M2N 2H4
Phone Number: (416) 222-0909

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REZA GHOBADIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOBADIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2010