THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:31:08 AM
Ghobadian, Reza
CPSO#:
86296
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ghobadian, Mohammad-Reza (used until: 14 Nov 2016 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Persian
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
103-80 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2N 2H4
Phone: 647-358-9623
Fax: 844-770-0080
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REZA GHOBADIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOBADIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2010 |