Ghadaki, Reyhaneh Honny (CPSO#: 96696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WellOne Medical Centre
Suite 103
18 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z8
Phone: (647) 748-5663
Fax: (647) 740-7166
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Reyhaneh Ghadaki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ghadaki ( CPSO# 96696 )

Business Address:
103 - 18 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z8
Phone Number: (647) 748-5663

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REYHANEH HONNY GHADAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADAKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014