THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:09:03 PM
Ghadaki, Reyhaneh Honny
CPSO#:
96696
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. Matthew's University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
WellOne Medical Centre
Suite 103
18 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M5E 1Z8
Phone: (647) 748-5663
Fax: (647) 740-7166
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REYHANEH HONNY GHADAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADAKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2014 |