skip to content

Gevorkyan, Rafael

CPSO#: 94751

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Kharkov Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
46 Adam Street
Cambridge ON  N3C 2K3
Phone: (519) 658-0040
Fax: (888) 651-9747 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 740-4938
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rafael Gevorkyan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gevorkyan ( CPSO# 94751 )

Business Address:
46 Adam Street
Cambridge ON  N3C 2K3
Phone Number: (519) 658-1413

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2016 Active
             Dr. Rafael Gevorkyan may practice medicine independently in family medicine.