THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:31:47 AM
Gevorkyan, Rafael
CPSO#:
94751
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: Kharkov Medical University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
46 Adam Street
Cambridge ON N3C 2K3
Phone: (519) 658-0040
Fax: (888) 651-9747
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jul 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jan 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 12 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jan 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 May 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 May 2016 |
|
Active |