skip to content

Germanus, Faten Shafik Andraous

CPSO#: 88796

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 North Service Rd O
Unit B17
Oakville Town Clinic
Oakville ON  L6M 2S2
Phone: 905-338-3730
Fax: 905-338-3731 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huron Square Medical Centre
14 - 2500 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-6160
Fax: (905) 897-6729
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

5295 Lakeshore Rd
St George Clinic
Burlington ON  L7L 1C7
Canada
Phone: 905-333-0065
Fax: 905-333-0024
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Faten Germanus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Germanus ( CPSO# 88796 )

Business Address:
2500 Hurontario Street, unit 14
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N4
Phone Number: 905-897-6160

Business Address:
300 North Service Rd W
Unit B17
Oakville Town Clinic
Oakville ON  L6M 2S2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FATEN SHAFIK ANDRAOUS GERMANUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERMANUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 06 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2015