THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:38:21 AM
Germanus, Faten Shafik Andraous
CPSO#:
88796
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300 North Service Rd O
Unit B17
Oakville Town Clinic
Oakville ON L6M 2S2
Phone: 905-338-3730
Fax: 905-338-3731
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FATEN SHAFIK ANDRAOUS GERMANUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERMANUS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 06 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2015 |