skip to content

Gerace, Rocco Vincent

CPSO#: 25637

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Seccareccia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gerace ( CPSO# 25637 )
Dr. D. Seccareccia ( CPSO# 58186 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4624

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROCCO VINCENT GERACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERACE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973