skip to content

Seccareccia, Dori-Lynn Marie

CPSO#: 58186

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Yukich, Dori-Lynn Marie (used until: 29 Jun 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4624
Fax: (416) 480-5144 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Seccareccia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gerace ( CPSO# 25637 )
Dr. D. Seccareccia ( CPSO# 58186 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4624

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DORI-LYNN MARIE SECCARECCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SECCARECCIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 02 Jan 1990 to 28 Feb 1990
EL - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1988