skip to content

George, Philip

CPSO#: 90003

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Critical Care Medicin
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Ext. 6366
Fax: (807) 684-5864 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Philip George Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. George ( CPSO# 90003 )

Business Address:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Critical Care Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:02 Oct 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013