THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 13:23:24 PM
George, Philip
CPSO#:
90003
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Malayalam
Education: University of Kerala, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Critical Care Medicin
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Ext. 6366
Fax: (807) 684-5864
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:02 Oct 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIP GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2013 |