skip to content

Geerlinks, Ashley Victoria

CPSO#: 100089

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
Children's Hospital
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: ASHLEY GEERLINKS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Geerlinks ( CPSO# 100089)

Business Address:
155 Westbrook Dr
Komoka ON  N0L 1R0
Phone Number: 519-488-1930

Business Address:
155 Westbrook Dr
Komoka ON  N0L 1R0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:25 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:28 Oct 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHLEY VICTORIA GEERLINKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEERLINKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 May 2013 to 31 May 2013
EL - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 12 Dec 2014
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2016 to 25 Nov 2016
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 28 Oct 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 28 Oct 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2021