THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:58:26 AM
Geerlinks, Ashley Victoria
CPSO#:
100089
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8494
Fax: 519-685-8384
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:25 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:28 Oct 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHLEY VICTORIA GEERLINKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEERLINKS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 May 2013 to 31 May 2013
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 12 Dec 2014
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2016 to 25 Nov 2016
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 28 Oct 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 28 Oct 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Nov 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2021 |