skip to content

Gauthier, Natalie Louise

CPSO#: 86920

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

200B-745 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Canada
Phone: 613-741-6767
Fax: 613-741-4147
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Natalie Gauthier Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gauthier ( CPSO# 86920 )

Business Address:
Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
745 Montreal Road
Suit e200B
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 741-6767

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:03 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATALIE LOUISE GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2011 to 16 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2012 to 03 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2013