THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:56:34 AM
Gauthier, Natalie Louise
CPSO#:
86920
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:03 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATALIE LOUISE GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2011 to 16 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2012 to 03 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2013 |