skip to content

Gandilo, Christina Nadia

CPSO#: 94562

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sydney, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1194 Karn Place
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z8
Phone: 613-521-0999
Fax: 613-521-0444 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

1194 Karn Place
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z2
Canada
Phone: 613-521-0999
Fax: 613-521-0444
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

PO Box 430 Stn Main
Manotick ON  K4M 1A4
Canada
Phone: 343-988-1322
Fax: 613-728-4062
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christina N. Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gandilo ( CPSO# 94562 )

Business Address:
404 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 728-1392

Business Address:
1194 Evans Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z4
Phone Number: (613) 521-0999


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA NADIA GANDILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDILO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2011