THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:44:44 PM
Gandilo, Christina Nadia
CPSO#:
94562
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1194 Karn Place
Ottawa ON K1H 7Z8
Phone: 613-521-0999
Fax: 613-521-0444
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA NADIA GANDILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDILO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Oct 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 24 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2011 |