skip to content

Ganame, Javier Ignacio

CPSO#: 85663

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Catolica de Cordoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Hospital
Fontbonne Building
Room F506 2
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32800
Fax: (905) 521-6068 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Javier Ganame Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ganame ( CPSO# 85663 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Room F506 2 - Fontbonne Building
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Room 3U5
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:07 Mar 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Oct 2006 to 20 Dec 2006
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 21 Dec 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2019 Active
             Dr. Javier Ignacio Ganame may practice medicine independently in cardiology.