THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:57:06 PM
Ganame, Javier Ignacio
CPSO#:
85663
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Catolica de Cordoba, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Hospital
Fontbonne Building
Room F506 2
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32800
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:07 Mar 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2006 to 20 Dec 2006
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 21 Dec 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Apr 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2019 |
|
Active |