skip to content

Perri, Giulia-Anna

CPSO#: 77712

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Perri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Perri ( CPSO# 77712 )

Business Address:
Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (647) 376-7005


Corporation Name: Houman Khosravani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Perri ( CPSO# 77712 )
Dr. H. Khosravani ( CPSO# 93444 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room A402
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St. Mary`s Hospital
911 Queen Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GIULIA-ANNA PERRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010