skip to content

Fusch, Christoph

CPSO#: 89436

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Fusch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:25 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2016