THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:43:10 AM
Fusch, Christoph
CPSO#:
89436
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C. Fusch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:25 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2016 |