skip to content

Fung, Sarah Sze Lok

CPSO#: 88569

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. L. Sarah Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 2 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2010 to 20 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2014