THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:53:07 AM
Fung, Sarah Sze Lok
CPSO#:
88569
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. L. Sarah Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 2 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2010 to 20 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2014 |