skip to content

Folman, Raphael

CPSO#: 21459

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933 2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 03 Jan 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:07 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 Dec 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018