THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 12:46:42 PM
Folman, Raphael
CPSO#:
21459
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hebrew, Polish
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON
M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: (647) 933 2904
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 03 Jan 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:07 Mar 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Aug 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 20 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 01 Dec 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |