skip to content

Fleury, Gilles

CPSO#: 86118

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 May 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 May 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Montfort Hospital
Room LB208
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T3
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 3917 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit # 1
53 Marier Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 5S2
Canada
Phone: 613-701-8337
Fax: 613-701-7899
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mary-Clare Royle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Royle ( CPSO# 79207 )
Dr. G. Fleury ( CPSO# 86118 )

Business Address:
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
101 Colonel by Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2


Corporation Name: Dr. Gilles Fleury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Royle ( CPSO# 79207 )
Dr. G. Fleury ( CPSO# 86118 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
53 Marier Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 5S2
Phone Number: (613) 701-8337

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Room 0B190
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T3
Phone Number: (613) 761-4621


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GILLES FLEURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLEURY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2007