skip to content

Finley, Christian John

CPSO#: 85803

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave East, Rm T2105H
Division of Thoracic Surgery
St. Joseph's Hospital
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33556 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Comley and Finley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Comley ( CPSO# 73622 )
Dr. C. Finley ( CPSO# 85803 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room T2105H
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Wallace Family Health Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective:05 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN JOHN FINLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
EL - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2010