skip to content

Finlayson, Olga Viktorovna

CPSO#: 89345

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:St. Petersburg State Medical Academy, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
TIA/Stroke/Neurology Clinic A Wing,
10 Trench street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905)883-1212
Fax: (905) 883-2246 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: 705-740-8321
Fax: 705-876-5172
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

7131 Bathurst St.
Unit 306
Thornhill ON  L4J7Z1
Canada
Phone: 4166339994
Fax: 9055978994
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Finlayson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Finlayson ( CPSO# 89345 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
TIA/Stroke/Neurology Clinic, A Wing, Room 100
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 740-8321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLGA VIKTOROVNA FINLAYSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLAYSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013