THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:05:01 AM
Finlayson, Olga Viktorovna
CPSO#:
89345
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: St. Petersburg State Medical Academy, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
TIA/Stroke/Neurology Clinic A Wing,
10 Trench street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905)883-1212
Fax: (905) 883-2246
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLGA VIKTOROVNA FINLAYSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINLAYSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Neurology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |