skip to content

Fernandez, Alcantro Bartholomeu Albino

CPSO#: 22038

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Sep 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1969
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of Dublin, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ridgeview Nursing Home Highland Rd
West Stoney Creek
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2C5
Phone: 905 561 3332
Fax: 905 561 0393 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Heritage Green Nursing Home
353 Isaac Brock
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2J3
Canada
Phone: 905 573 7177
Fax: 905 573 7151
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Maliha Ali Hass Sherman 60 Centennial Parkway South Stoney Creek ON L8G 2C5
Date Received: 04 Mar 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALCANTRO BARTHOLOMEU ALBINO FERNANDEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDEZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1969
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Apr 1997
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 30 Sep 1997

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Dec 1996
Summary:

 In December 1996, Dr. Fernandez pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined 
 in s. 34(3)(c) of the Medical Act, 1970, as amended, in that he had been guilty of misconduct in a 
 professional respect and of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner.  Dr. Fernandez also pleaded 
 guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulations 577/75, and 
 448/80, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
 regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31) and s. 27(32), respectively.  The Committee 
 accepted Dr. Fernandez( guilty pleas based on an Agreed Statement of Facts and found him guilty of 
 professional misconduct.

The Committee ordered the following penalty:

1)	Dr. Fernandez was to be 
 reprimanded with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2)	Dr. Fernandez( 
 certificate of registration was to be suspended for a period of six months.  The period of 
 suspension shall commence on a date which shall be fixed by the Registrar, who shall take this 
 action within 60 days of the date on which this Order becomes final.  In any event, the term of 
 this suspension shall commence not more than 180 days after the date on which this order becomes 
 final.

3)	Dr. Fernandez was to pay a fine of $5,000.00 within 60 days of the Order becoming 
 final.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 09, 1996