THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:54:09 AM
Fernandez, Alcantro Bartholomeu Albino
CPSO#:
22038
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Swahili
Education: University of Dublin, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
18 Hilts Drive Stoney Creek on.
Stoney Creek ON L8G 3H6
Phone: 905 662 1246
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
c/o Dr. Maliha Ali Hass Sherman
60 Centennial Parkway South
Stoney Creek ON L8G 2C5
Date Received: 04 Mar 2016
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALCANTRO BARTHOLOMEU ALBINO FERNANDEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDEZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1969 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Apr 1997 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 30 Sep 1997 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Dec 1996
Summary:
In December 1996, Dr. Fernandez pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 34(3)(c) of the Medical Act, 1970, as amended, in that he had been guilty of misconduct in a professional respect and of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner. Dr. Fernandez also pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulations 577/75, and 448/80, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31) and s. 27(32), respectively. The Committee accepted Dr. Fernandez( guilty pleas based on an Agreed Statement of Facts and found him guilty of professional misconduct.
The Committee ordered the following penalty:
1) Dr. Fernandez was to be reprimanded with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2) Dr. Fernandez( certificate of registration was to be suspended for a period of six months. The period of suspension shall commence on a date which shall be fixed by the Registrar, who shall take this action within 60 days of the date on which this Order becomes final. In any event, the term of this suspension shall commence not more than 180 days after the date on which this order becomes final.
3) Dr. Fernandez was to pay a fine of $5,000.00 within 60 days of the Order becoming final.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 09, 1996