skip to content

Ferguson, Kerry Graham

CPSO#: 17895

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jun 1961

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

The Village of Erin Meadows
2930 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga, ON  L5M 7M4
Date Received: 12 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014