THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:30:06 PM
Ferguson, Kerry Graham
CPSO#:
17895
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jun 1961
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Village of Erin Meadows
2930 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga, ON L5M 7M4
Date Received: 12 May 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:28 Nov 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1960 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |