skip to content

Yazdani Boroujeni, Fereshteh

CPSO#: 81835

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1019
4789 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 0G3
Phone: 647-748-4448
Fax: (647-689-3310 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yazdani Boroujeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Yazdani Boroujeni ( CPSO# 81835 )

Business Address:
Suite 8
8 Greystone Walk Drive
Toronto ON  M1K 5J2
Phone Number: (416) 266-5888

Business Address:
4789 Yonge Street
Suite 1019
Toronto ON  M2N 0G3
Phone Number: (647) 748-4448

Business Address:
5-9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (905) 597-2528

Business Address:
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Phone Number: (416) 264-4848

Business Address:
Unit 5
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (905) 597-2528

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 28 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2020
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2020
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 16 Oct 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 03 Jan 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 03 Jan 2024 Active
 Dr. Fereshteh Yazdani Boroujeni may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.

 




Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Apr 2020
Summary:

On April 15, 2020, on the basis of agreed facts and admission, the Discipline Committee (the “Committee”) of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Fereshteh Yazdani Boroujeni (“Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni”) committed an act of professional misconduct. The Committee set out its penalty and costs order with written reasons to follow.

FACTS

BACKGROUND

Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni is a sixty-eight (68) year old paediatrician who currently practises medicine in Toronto and Richmond Hill, Ontario. At all relevant times, between 2014 and 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni practised at various medical clinics located in Guelph, Scarborough, Richmond Hill and Toronto. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni also held hospital privileges at Guelph General Hospital in Guelph until 2016.

On August 30, 2006, the Registration Committee of the College issued Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni a restricted certificate of registration to practice medicine in Ontario with terms, conditions and limitations permitting her to practise paediatrics only, under supervision. On September 11, 2014, the Registration Committee amended the terms, conditions and limitations of Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni’s certificate of registration, permitting Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni to practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.

CONTRAVENE A TERM, CONDITION OR LIMITATION ON HER CERTIFICATE OF REGISTRATION

Information received by the College in November 2017

On November 14, 2017, the College was contacted by a pharmacist in Toronto with inquiries about Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni’s practice restrictions. The pharmacist reported that she had received a prescription for Flovent and Ventolin written by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni for a 37 year-old patient. On November 16, 2017, the College obtained additional information from the pharmacist including that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni had also written a prescription in August of 2017 for Amoxicillin for a 35 year-old patient.

On November 29, 2017, as a result of telephone inquiries made to three different pharmacies, the College learned that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni had written several prescriptions for patients who were over 18 years old. The records of one pharmacy show that between November 2016 and November 2017, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni wrote prescriptions for 11 patients who were over eighteen 18 years old.

On January 9, 2018, the College wrote to Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni notifying her that the College was conducting an investigation and enclosing the information received from the pharmacists, described above.
January 1, 2015 to December 31, 2017: Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated and submitted OHIP claims for adults, contrary to a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration

Data obtained by the College from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) for the date range of January 1, 2015 to December 31, 2017 (“the first set of OHIP data”), shows that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni submitted claims for 1,384 patients over the age of 25 years old in that time period. The age range of the adult patients treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni in the above-mentioned time period is as follows:

- 542 patients between the ages of 25 and 34 years old;
- 394 patients between the ages of 35 and 44 years old;
- 214 patients between the ages of 45 and 54 years old;
- 129 patients between the ages of 55 and 64 years old;
- 72 patients between the ages of 65 and 74 years old;
- 25 patients between the ages of 75 and 84 years old; and 
- 8 patients between the ages of 85 and 94 years old.

During the investigation, the College requested patient charts of five adult patients where Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni had submitted claims to OHIP, including claims under OHIP billing code K002 (interviews with relatives on behalf of patient). The College also requested the corresponding child patient charts for these five adult patients. On December 18, 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni provided the College with the requested five adult patient charts and advised the College that she had no corresponding child patient charts for these adult patients.

The College also requested and received five patient charts for adult patients over the
age of 70.

The patient charts of the five adult patients where Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni submitted claims under OHIP billing code K002 show that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni saw and treated each of these five adult patients on more than one occasion and for various health concerns:
• Patient A: This 75 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on four separate occasions between May 2017 and September 2017, for concerns including back pain, stomach pain, and itchy and burning eyes.
• Patient B: This 38 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on six separate occasions between October 2017 and December 2017, for concerns including anxiety and related weight loss. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni provided this patient with counselling, ordered blood work, and administered a vaccine.
• Patient C: This 51 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on five occasions between June 2017 and December 2017 for concerns including a cold, sinusitis, ear pain and follow up care. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni prescribed this patient medications.
• Patient D: This 47 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on five occasions between May 2017 and November 2017 by administering testosterone injections that were prescribed by another physician.
• Patient E: This 38 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on four occasions between June 2017 and July 2017 for concerns including itchy skin and hive rash, infertility and follow-up care. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni provided this patient with counselling and administered B12 injections.

The patient charts of the five adult patients over the age of 70 show that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni saw and treated each of these five adult patients on more than one occasion and for various health concerns:
• Patient F: This 92 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on three occasions between October 2017 and December 2017. On each occasion, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni administered a B12 injection to the patient.
• Patient G: This 81 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on two occasions between November 2016 and October 2017. In 2016, the patient attended in respect of a urinalysis result. In 2017, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni administered the flu shot to the patient.
• Patient H: This 79 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on two occasions between November 2016 and May 2017. In 2016, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni administered the flu shot to the patient. In 2017, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated the patient for concerns of chest pain and flank pain.
• Patient I: This 75 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on two occasions in December 2017 for concerns which included anxiety and poor sleep. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni conducted an examination and provided counselling.
• Patient J: This 81 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on two occasions between September 2017 and October 2017 for concerns of hives on the face and lips. The patient was provided counselling and follow-up care.

 
January 9, 2018 to June 20, 2018: Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni continued to treat and submit OHIP claims for adult patients following notification by the College
 
The College requested additional OHIP data for claims submitted by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni between January 9, 2018 and July 27, 2018 (“the second set of OHIP data”). The second set of OHIP data shows that between January 9, 2018 (the date Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni was notified by the College), and June 20, 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni submitted claims to OHIP for services rendered to adult patients as follows:
• Four adult patients on January 9, 2018 [Note: one patient was treated prior to receipt of the College notification letter]; and
• One adult patient on June 20, 2018.
 
The College obtained the patient charts for the patients above. The patient charts show that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni provided care and treatment to these five adult patients on January 9, 2018 and June 20, 2018. In providing care and treatment to these adult patients Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni contravened a term, condition and limitation on her certificate of registration.

DISGRACEFUL, DISHONOURABLE OR UNPROFESSIONAL CONDUCT
 
(i) Contravene a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration
 
By treating adult patients, contrary to a term, condition or limitation on her certificate on registration, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.
 
(ii) Treating adult patients following notification by the College on January 9, 2018
 
As noted above, the College notified Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni of its investigation on January 9, 2018. Following receipt of the College’s notification letter, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni provided treatment to four adult patients contrary to a term, condition, limitation on her certificate of registration.
 
As noted above, the College obtained the patient charts for the four adult patients Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated following the notification letter. The patient charts and OHIP data provide the following information:
 
• On January 9, 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated a 38 year old patient for concerns including skin rash and nasal and snoring issues and prescribed Nasonex.
• On January 9, 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated a 37 year old patient for concerns including breathing issues, nasal congestion and snoring, and prescribed Nasonex.
• On January 9, 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated a 34 year old patient for a skin rash. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni conducted a skin prick test for food allergens and referred the patient to a dermatologist.
• On June 20, 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated a 35 year old patient for concerns of breast feeding and nipple pain and conducted an examination of patient’s the nipple area. This patient was the parent of a pediatric patient.
 
(iii) Providing misleading and inaccurate information in the course of the College’s investigation
 
In the course of its investigation, on June 13, 2018, the College provided the first set of OHIP data to Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni, showing that she treated 1,384 adult patients over the age of 25 between January 1, 2015 to December 31, 2017.
 
On July 9, 2018, the College received a response from Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni, stating that she saw adult patients for minor issues; that she was never involved in the long- term care of any adult patient; and that if any adult patient needed follow-up, she asked them to book an appointment with their family doctor. The OHIP data and patient charts disclose that, in fact, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated some adult patients on an ongoing basis and did in fact provide them with follow-up care.
 
Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni also stated in her response that, after receiving the College’s notification letter of January 9, 2018, she understood that what she was doing was unacceptable to the College and, as of January 9, 2018, she immediately stopped seeing patients over the age of 18 and had stopped counselling parents in the manner that she had before. In fact, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni continued to treat and submit claims to OHIP for services rendered to adult patients, as set out above.
 
In her 2015 to 2017 Annual Renewal surveys submitted to the College, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni stated that she practised solely in the area of paediatrics in accordance with the restriction on her certificate of registration. In fact, she was treating adult patients as set out above
 
On January 22, 2018, the College received a physician questionnaire signed and completed by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni (dated January 12, 2018), following the notification letter from the College. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni identified her practice on the physician questionnaire as code 602 (pediatrics) and code 607 (pediatric allergy). The physician questionnaire inaccurately states that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni was practising in accordance with the restriction on her certificate of registration.
ADMISSION
 
Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni admits the facts specified above, and admits that, based on these facts, she engaged in professional misconduct as follows:
 
- she contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration; and
 
- she engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
 
FINDING
 
The Committee found that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni committed an act of professional misconduct under:
- paragraph 1(1)1 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that she has contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration; and
- paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
-
PENALTY AND COSTS

FACTS ON PENALTY

On May 25, 2019, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni signed an undertaking in lieu of a section 25.4 Order of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.18, limiting her practice to paediatrics only and agreeing to monitoring by the College.

Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni has no prior discipline history with the College.

During the course of the investigation, the College obtained Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni’s OHIP data for the period of August 1, 2018 to January 22, 2019, which indicated that she did not submit any claims for patients over the age of eighteen (18) for that period.

ORDER

The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni to attend before the panel to be reprimanded.

The Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni’s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, commencing from April 16, 2020 at 12:01 a.m.

The Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni’s certificate of registration, effective immediately:

- Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical Practice”.
- Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni shall participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program (“PROBE Program”) offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni will complete the first available PROBE Program offered in Toronto, and will provide proof to the College of her completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it.
- Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni shall consent to the monitoring of her Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) billings and claims on a bi-annual basis for a period of three (3) years by the College. The monitoring shall include making enquiries of the Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care regarding Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni’s billings and claims.
- Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni shall inform the College of each and every location where she practices, in any jurisdiction (her “Practice Location(s)”), within fifteen (15) days of this Order and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location for a period of three (3) years.
- Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with complying with the terms of this Order.

The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni to pay costs to the College of this proceeding in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of the Order.

On June 9, 2020, the Committee released its Reasons for decision in this matter. The full decision is available for review on the College website.
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): April 15, 2020 Reprimand: August 27, 2020 at 2:30 p.m.