skip to content

Yazdani Boroujeni, Fereshteh

CPSO#: 81835

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 16 Apr 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yazdani Boroujeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Yazdani Boroujeni ( CPSO# 81835 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (905) 597-2528

Business Address:
5-9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (905) 597-2528

Business Address:
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Phone Number: (416) 264-4848

Business Address:
Suite 8
8 Greystone Walk Drive
Toronto ON  M1K 5J2
Phone Number: (416) 266-5888

Business Address:
4789 Yonge Street
Suite 1019
Toronto ON  M2N 0G3
Phone Number: (647) 748-4448

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 28 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2020
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2020

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 16 Apr 2020


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2020 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Apr 2020
Summary:

On April 15, 2020, on the basis of agreed facts and admission, the Discipline Committee 
(the “Committee”) of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. 
Fereshteh Yazdani Boroujeni (“Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni”) committed an act of professional 
misconduct. The Committee set out its penalty and costs order with written reasons to 
follow. 

FACTS 

BACKGROUND 
 
Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni is a sixty-eight (68) year old paediatrician who currently practises 
medicine in Toronto and Richmond Hill, Ontario. At all relevant times, between 2014 and 
2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni practised at various medical clinics located in Guelph, 
Scarborough, Richmond Hill and Toronto. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni also held hospital 
privileges at Guelph General Hospital in Guelph until 2016. 
 
On August 30, 2006, the Registration Committee of the College issued Dr. Yazdani 
Boroujeni a restricted certificate of registration to practice medicine in Ontario with 
terms, conditions and limitations permitting her to practise paediatrics only, under 
supervision. On September 11, 2014, the Registration Committee amended the terms, 
conditions and limitations of Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni’s certificate of registration, 
permitting Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni to practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.      
 
CONTRAVENE A TERM, CONDITION OR LIMITATION ON HER CERTIFICATE OF 
REGISTRATION 
 
Information received by the College in November 2017   
  
On November 14, 2017, the College was contacted by a pharmacist in Toronto with 
inquiries about Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni’s practice restrictions.  The pharmacist reported 
that she had received a prescription for Flovent and Ventolin written by Dr. Yazdani 
Boroujeni for a 37 year-old patient. On November 16, 2017, the College obtained 
additional information from the pharmacist including that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni had 
also written a prescription in August of 2017 for Amoxicillin for a 35 year-old patient. 
 
On November 29, 2017, as a result of telephone inquiries made to three different 
pharmacies, the College learned that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni had written several 
prescriptions for patients who were over 18 years old.  The records of one pharmacy 
show that between November 2016 and November 2017, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni wrote 
prescriptions for 11 patients who were over eighteen 18 years old.  
 
On January 9, 2018, the College wrote to Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni notifying her that the 
College was conducting an investigation and enclosing the information received from 
the pharmacists, described above.   
 January 1, 2015 to December 31, 2017: Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated and submitted 
 OHIP claims for adults, contrary to a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of 
 registration  
 
Data obtained by the College from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) for the 
date range of January 1, 2015 to December 31, 2017 (“the first set of OHIP data”), 
 shows  that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni submitted claims for 1,384 patients over the age of 
 25 years old in that time period. The age range of the adult patients treated by Dr. 
 Yazdani Boroujeni in the above-mentioned time period is as follows:  
  
    -  542 patients between the ages of 25 and 34 years old; 
    -  394 patients between the ages of 35 and 44 years old; 
    -  214 patients between the ages of 45 and 54 years old; 
    -  129 patients between the ages of 55 and 64 years old; 
    -  72 patients between the ages of 65 and 74 years old;  
    -  25 patients between the ages of 75 and 84 years old; and  
    -  8 patients between the ages of 85 and 94 years old. 
     
 During the investigation, the College requested patient charts of five adult patients 
 where Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni had submitted claims to OHIP, including claims under OHIP 
 billing code K002 (interviews with relatives on behalf of patient). The College also 
 requested the corresponding child patient charts for these five adult patients. On 
 December 18, 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni provided the College with the requested five 
 adult patient charts and advised the College that she had no corresponding child patient 
 charts for these adult patients.   
  
 The College also requested and received five patient charts for adult patients over the 
 age of 70. 
      
 The patient charts of the five adult patients where Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni submitted 
 claims under OHIP billing code K002 show that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni saw and treated 
 each of these five adult patients on more than one occasion and for various health 
 concerns: 
    •  Patient A: This 75 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on four 
       separate occasions between May 2017 and September 2017, for concerns 
       including back pain, stomach pain, and itchy and burning eyes.   
    •  Patient B: This 38 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on six  
       separate occasions between October 2017 and December 2017, for concerns 
       including anxiety and related weight loss. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni provided this 
       patient with counselling, ordered blood work, and administered a vaccine.  
    •  Patient C: This 51 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on five 
       occasions between June 2017 and December 2017 for concerns including a 
       cold, sinusitis, ear pain and follow up care. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni prescribed this 
       patient medications. 
    •  Patient D: This 47 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on five 
       occasions between May 2017 and November 2017 by administering 
       testosterone injections that were prescribed by another physician.   
    •  Patient E: This 38 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on four  
       occasions between June 2017 and July 2017 for concerns including itchy skin 
       and hive rash, infertility and follow-up care. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni provided this 
       patient with counselling and administered B12 injections.  
  
 The patient charts of the five adult patients over the age of 70 show that Dr. Yazdani 
 Boroujeni saw and treated each of these five adult patients on more than one occasion 
 and for various health concerns: 
    •  Patient F: This 92 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on three 
       occasions between October 2017 and December 2017. On each occasion, Dr. 
       Yazdani Boroujeni administered a B12 injection to the patient.   
    •  Patient G: This 81 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on two  
       occasions between November 2016 and October 2017. In 2016, the patient 
       attended in respect of a urinalysis result. In 2017, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni 
       administered the flu shot to the patient.  
    •  Patient H: This 79 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on two  
       occasions between November 2016 and May 2017. In 2016, Dr. Yazdani 
       Boroujeni administered the flu shot to the patient. In 2017, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni 
       treated the patient for concerns of chest pain and flank pain. 
    •  Patient I: This 75 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on two 
       occasions in December 2017 for concerns which included anxiety and poor 
       sleep. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni conducted an examination and provided 
       counselling.  
    •  Patient J: This 81 year old patient was treated by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni on two 
       occasions between September 2017 and October 2017 for concerns of hives on 
       the face and lips. The patient was provided counselling and follow-up care.  
  
 January 9, 2018 to June 20, 2018: Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni continued to treat and submit 
 OHIP claims for adult patients following notification by the College 
 
The College requested additional OHIP data for claims submitted by Dr. Yazdani 
Boroujeni between January 9, 2018 and July 27, 2018 (“the second set of OHIP data”). 
The second set of OHIP data shows that between January 9, 2018 (the date Dr. Yazdani 
Boroujeni was notified by the College), and June 20, 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni 
submitted claims to OHIP for services rendered to adult patients as follows:  
           •  Four adult patients on January 9, 2018 [Note: one patient was treated 
              prior to receipt of the College notification letter]; and  
           •  One adult patient on June 20, 2018. 
               
The College obtained the patient charts for the patients above. The patient charts show 
that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni provided care and treatment to these five adult patients on 
 January 9, 2018 and June 20, 2018.  In providing care and treatment to these adult 
 patients Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni contravened a term, condition and limitation on her 
certificate of registration.   
  
 DISGRACEFUL, DISHONOURABLE OR UNPROFESSIONAL CONDUCT 
  
 (i) Contravene a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration  
  
 By treating adult patients, contrary to a term, condition or limitation on her certificate on 
 registration, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional conduct.  
  
  (ii) Treating adult patients following notification by the College on January 9, 2018 
  
 As noted above, the College notified Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni of its investigation on 
 January 9, 2018. Following receipt of the College’s notification letter, Dr. Yazdani 
 Boroujeni provided treatment to four adult patients contrary to a term, condition, 
 limitation on her certificate of registration. 
   
 As noted above, the College obtained the patient charts for the four adult patients Dr. 
 Yazdani Boroujeni treated following the notification letter. The patient charts and OHIP 
 data provide the following information:  
 
   •  On January 9, 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated a 38 year old patient for 
      concerns including skin rash and nasal and snoring issues and prescribed 
      Nasonex.  
   •  On January 9, 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated a 37 year old patient for 
      concerns including breathing issues, nasal congestion and snoring, and 
      prescribed Nasonex.  
   •  On January 9, 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated a 34 year old patient for a skin 
      rash. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni conducted a skin prick test for food allergens and 
      referred the patient to a dermatologist.  
   •  On June 20, 2018, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated a 35 year old patient for 
      concerns of breast feeding and nipple pain and conducted an examination of 
      patient’s the nipple area. This patient was the parent of a pediatric patient.  
 
(iii) Providing misleading and inaccurate information in the course of the College’s 
investigation 
 
In the course of its investigation, on June 13, 2018, the College provided the first set of 
OHIP data to Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni, showing that she treated 1,384 adult patients over 
the age of 25 between January 1, 2015 to December 31, 2017. 
 
 On July 9, 2018, the College received a response from Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni, stating 
 that she saw adult patients for minor issues; that she was never involved in the long-
 term care of any adult patient; and that if any adult patient needed follow-up, she asked 
 them to book an appointment with their family doctor. The OHIP data and patient charts 
 disclose that, in fact, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni treated some adult patients on an ongoing 
 basis and did in fact provide them with follow-up care.  
  
 Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni also stated in her response that, after receiving the College’s 
 notification letter of  January 9, 2018, she understood  that what she was doing was 
 unacceptable to the College and, as of January 9, 2018, she immediately stopped 
 seeing patients over the age of 18 and had stopped counselling parents in the manner 
 that she had before. In fact, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni continued to treat and submit claims 
 to OHIP for services rendered to adult patients, as set out above.   
  
 In her 2015 to 2017 Annual Renewal surveys submitted to the College, Dr. Yazdani 
 Boroujeni stated that she practised solely in the area of paediatrics in accordance with 
 the restriction on her certificate of registration. In fact, she was treating adult patients 
 as set out above 
   
 On January 22, 2018, the College received a physician questionnaire signed and 
 completed by Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni (dated January 12, 2018), following the notification 
 letter from the College. Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni identified her practice on the physician 
 questionnaire as code 602 (pediatrics) and code 607 (pediatric allergy). The physician 
 questionnaire inaccurately states that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni was practising in 
 accordance with the restriction on her certificate of registration.    
  
 ADMISSION 
  
 Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni admits the facts specified above, and admits that, based on these 
 facts, she engaged in professional misconduct as follows:  
  
    -  she contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration; 
       and 
  
    -  she engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
       having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
       members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
        
 FINDING 
  
 The Committee found that Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni committed an act of professional 
misconduct under: 
    -  paragraph 1(1)1 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 
       1991, in that she has contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate 
       of registration; and 
    -  paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 
       1991, in that she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
       medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
       regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
   -   
PENALTY AND COSTS 
 
FACTS ON PENALTY  
 
On May 25, 2019, Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni signed an undertaking in lieu of a section 25.4 
Order of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is schedule 2 to the Regulated 
Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.18, limiting her practice to paediatrics only 
and agreeing to monitoring by the College.  
   
Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni has no prior discipline history with the College. 
 
During the course of the investigation, the College obtained Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni’s 
OHIP data for the period of August 1, 2018 to January 22, 2019, which indicated that 
she did not submit any claims for patients over the age of eighteen (18) for that period.  
 
ORDER 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni to attend before the panel to 
be reprimanded. 
 
The Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni’s 
 certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, commencing from April 16, 
 2020 at 12:01 a.m. 

 The Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to place the following terms, conditions 
 and limitations on Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni’s certificate of registration, effective 
 immediately:  

    -  Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical 
       Practice”. 
    -  Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni shall participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries 
       Program (“PROBE Program”) offered by the Centre for Personalized Education 
       for Professionals, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any 
       condition or qualification.  Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni will complete the first available 
       PROBE Program offered in Toronto, and will provide proof to the College of her 
       completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant 
       assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. 
   -  Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni shall consent to the monitoring of her Ontario Health 
     Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) billings and claims on a bi-annual basis for a period of 
      three (3) years by the College. The monitoring shall include making enquiries of 
      the Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care regarding Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni’s 
      billings and claims.   
   -  Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni shall inform the College of each and every location where 
      she practices, in any jurisdiction (her “Practice Location(s)”), within fifteen (15) 
      days of this Order and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice 
      Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location for a 
      period of three (3) years.   
   -  Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with 
      complying with the terms of this Order.   

The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Yazdani Boroujeni to pay costs to the College of 
this proceeding in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of the 
Order. 

On June 9, 2020, the Committee released its Reasons for decision in this matter. The 
full decision is available for review on the College website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): April 15, 2020