skip to content

Feller, Andrea Eve

CPSO#: 85584

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Sep 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Sep 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Johns Hopkins University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Region Public Health
1815 Sir Isaac Brock Way
Thorold ON  L2V 0A2
Phone: (905) 688-3762
Fax: (905) 682-3901 Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Maryland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective:12 Nov 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pediatrics Effective:21 Aug 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Nov 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Nov 2016 Active
                   Dr.  Andrea  Eve  Feller may practise medicine independently in community
                  medicine and paediatrics.