THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:33:29 AM
Feller, Andrea Eve
CPSO#:
85584
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Johns Hopkins University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Region Public Health
1815 Sir Isaac Brock Way
Thorold ON L2V 0A2
Phone: (905) 688-3762
Fax: (905) 682-3901
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Community Medicine |
Effective:12 Nov 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Pediatrics |
Effective:21 Aug 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Sep 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 07 Mar 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Nov 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Nov 2016 |
|
Active |