skip to content

Feldmann, Joseph

CPSO#: 23973

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2023
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joseph Feldmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 27 2023

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2023